VA HB2354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act; school boards and school board employees. Provides that school divisions located in Planning District 4, New River Valley, are not subject to the prohibition against hiring a school division employee who is related to a member of the school board under certain circumstances.
Title
Conflict of Interests Act, State and Local Government; school board employees, Planning District 4.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2354ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105718D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2354S1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105718D-S1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105718D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103245D |