VA HB235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Persons occupying street for commercial use; civil penalty. Allows cities and towns by ordinance to establish a uniform schedule of civil penalties for commercial use of a street, avenue, park, bridge, or any other public place or public property or any public easement of a city or town, in a manner not permitted to the general public, without having first legally obtained the consent of the city or town. The bill provides that the schedule of civil penalties shall be uniform for each type of specified violation, and the penalty for any one violation, unless elsewhere authorized, shall not exceed (i) $500 for the initial penalty, (ii) $1,000 for the second violation, or (iii) $1,500 for the third or subsequent violation.
Title
Persons occupying street for commercial use; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101458D |