VA HB2349 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Maximum speed limits. Provides that the maximum speed limit shall be 60 miles per hour where indicated by lawfully placed signs, erected subsequent to a traffic engineering study and analysis of available and appropriate accident and law-enforcement data, on primary highways where they are nonlimited access, multilane, divided highways.
Title
Maximum speed limits; shall be 60 miles per hour where indicated by lawfully placed signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102766D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2349 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2349+hil |