VA HB2343 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public School Security Equipment Grant Act of 2013. Requires the Virginia Public School Authority to issue bonds for the funding of matching grants to local public school divisions for the purchase and installation of security equipment in public schools. The security equipment must be designed to improve and help ensure the safety of students attending public schools in Virginia. The Authority cannot issue more than $6 million in bonds in any fiscal year of the Commonwealth, and no more than an aggregate principal amount of $30 million in bonds may be outstanding at any time under the program. A local school division would be eligible to receive up to $100,000 in security equipment grants each fiscal year. Local school divisions would apply to the Department of Education for the grants, which would be awarded on a competitive basis. The local school division would be required to match 25 percent of the grant amount. The Superintendent of Public Instruction would be authorized to reduce the required match for local school divisions with a composite index of local ability-to-pay less than 0.2000. The provisions of the bill are made contingent upon funding in the general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public school security equipment; issuance of bonds for purpose of grant payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
2013-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-03-04SenateSigned by President
2013-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2343ER)
2013-03-04HouseEnrolled
2013-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2013-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2013-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2013-02-23SenateSenators: Newman, Hanger, Vogel
2013-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2013-02-22HouseDelegates: Sherwood, Cox, M.K., Joannou
2013-02-22HouseConferees appointed by House
2013-02-22HouseHouse acceded to request
2013-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2013-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N)
2013-02-22HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 93-N)
2013-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2013-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2013-02-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2013-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2013-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2013-02-21SenateRead second time
2013-02-21SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2013-02-20SenateRereferred to Finance
2013-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N)
2013-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2013-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-02-18HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2343H2
2013-02-15HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 13105216D-H2
2013-02-15HouseCommittee on Militia, Police and Public Safety substitute rejected 13105076D-H1
2013-02-15HouseRead second time
2013-02-14HouseRead first time
2013-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 13105216D-H2
2013-02-13HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2013-02-11HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 13105076D-H1
2013-02-11HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2013-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2013-02-08HousePresented and ordered printed 13104960D
2013-02-08HouseIntroduced at the request of Governor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91184.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91184.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2343
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2343+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2343H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2343H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2343ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0608+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H15V0100+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H02V0136+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1005+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S04V0221+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S05V0278+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0819HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0820HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1242+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0872HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0908HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1280+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1281+HB2343

Bill Comments

feedback