VA HB2340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle license plates and registration; taxes and penalties. Increases from $100 to $150 the maximum license tax that a locality is authorized to impose annually on motor vehicles not displaying current license plates. The bill increases from up to $250 to up to $350 the penalty on motor vehicles that have not been registered within the first 30 days of an individual's residency in the Commonwealth.
Title
Motor vehicle license plates and registration; increases taxes and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (6-Y 9-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 14-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 14-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2023-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104119D |