VA HB2338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alerts for missing veterans who have a service-related health condition.
Title
Veterans; alerts for those missing who have a service-related health condition.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Del. Daniel Marshall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103598D |