VA HB2334 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; enforcement; authority of investigators. Provides that any complaint alleging an act or omission of a regulant that is within the jurisdiction of any regulatory board under the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation for which compliance has not been obtained shall not be closed at the intake stage, during the investigation, or at the close of an investigation unless such closure has been approved by the appropriate regulatory board.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; enforcement, authority of investigators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101679D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |