VA HB2327 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; enhanced retirement benefits for 911 dispatchers. Allows local governments to provide enhanced retirement benefits for hazardous duty service to full-time salaried 911 dispatchers. The bill provides that such enhanced retirement benefits apply only to service earned as a full-time salaried 911 dispatcher on or after July 1, 2024, but allows an employer, as that term is defined in relevant law, to provide such enhanced retirement benefits for service earned as a full-time salaried 911 dispatcher before July 1, 2024, in addition to service earned on or after that date. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2024.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; enhanced retirement benefits for 911 dispatchers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23100311D |
Subjects
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Local Government and Officials
Pensions Benefits and Retirement
Retirement Systems
Local Government and Officials
Pensions Benefits and Retirement
Retirement Systems