VA HB2326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-22 - Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide prioritization process; primary evacuation routes. Adds maintenance of primary evacuation routes to the factors that must be considered by the Commonwealth Transportation Board in the statewide prioritization process, commonly known as SMART SCALE.
Title
Statewide prioritization process; primary evacuation routes.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Brewer [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] |
Del. Jason Miyares [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Tabled in Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102881D |