VA HB2326 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regional strategic plans. Provides that in planning districts in which regional planning is conducted by multi-state councils of government, each planning district commission may prepare a regional strategic plan for the guidance of the district.
Title
Regional strategic plans; preparation and adoption by planning district commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2326ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (15-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13104200D |