VA HB2325 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Application for a concealed handgun permit; photo identification. Requires applicants for a concealed handgun permit to present one valid form of government-issued photo identification issued by a governmental agency of the Commonwealth or by the U.S. Department of Defense or U.S. State Department (passport). The bill removes the requirement that the application be made under oath before a notary.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; application for permit requires photo identification.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2325ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2325H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104517D-H1 |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104517D-H1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103590D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.010 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |