VA HB2325 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Utility pole attachments; broadband service providers. Requires each public utility, including electric cooperatives, to provide broadband service providers with neutral and nondiscriminatory access to any pole, duct, conduit, or right-of-way it owns or controls. The State Corporation Commission (SCC) is authorized to determine just and reasonable rates, terms, conditions, and costs for such attachments to its poles. The existing provisions that address pole attachments by telecommunications service providers and cable television systems are conformed to these new provisions for broadband service providers. The SCC is directed, in implementing the provisions of this measure, to rely on interpretations by the Federal Communications Commission and the federal judiciary of terms and concepts included in this measure that are used or defined in the pole attachments section of the federal Communications Act.
Title
Utility pole attachments; broadband service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104648D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103189D |