VA HB2324 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Investment in research and technology in the Commonwealth. Amends the Commonwealth Research Commercialization Fund (CRCF) to allow for awards for a matching funds program and an eminent researcher program. The bill also expands upon the Innovation and Entrepreneurship Investment Authority's (IEIA) current responsibility to develop a strategic roadmap for research in the Commonwealth. The roadmap shall identify areas of focus for research investment in the Commonwealth based upon criteria set forth in the bill, and any awards from the CRCF must fall into one of these areas of focus. The bill establishes a Research and Technology Investment Advisory Committee to assist the IEIA in making awards from the CRCF by ensuring that applications considered for awards are based upon sound science and research, are in an area of focus identified in the roadmap, and present significant potential for commercialization in the Commonwealth. This bill incorporates
Title
Virginia Research and Technology Investment Program; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 816 (effective 4/6/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2324ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2324ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-25 | Conference: Emergency clause added by conference committee | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference substitute printed 11105616D-H2 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Herring, Newman, Marsden | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Lingamfelter, May, Sickles | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 11105406D-S1 (1-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2324S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105406D-S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105406D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2324H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104817D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporates HB1639 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporates HB2250 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104817D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101317D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Similar To) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
HB1639 (Similar To) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
SB1485 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0874)
HB1639 (Similar To) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
SB1485 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0874)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2233.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 436 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 444 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |