VA HB2250 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State Council of Higher Education for Virginia; creation of nonstock corporation to support academic research. Requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to establish a nonprofit, nonstock corporation under Chapter 10 (§13.1-801 et seq.) of Title 13.1 as a public instrumentality exercising public and essential governmental functions to assist the Council in (i) supporting academic research in Virginia; (ii) encouraging research initiatives, with emphasis on biological systems and nanotechnology, to support Virginia industry; (iii) directing the disbursement of funds for such research initiatives based on established scientific criteria from the Academic Research Initiative Fund, created pursuant to this bill; and (iv) conducting or undertaking other activities useful in carrying out the provisions of this bill. The Council shall require such corporation to report to it at least annually on its activities. The bill sets out the composition of the board of directors for such corporation. This bill was incorporated into HB 2324 (Lingamfelter).
Title
SCHEV; creation of nonstock corporation to support academic research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2324-Lingamfelter) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2324-Lingamfelter) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102573D |