VA HB2321 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; application to the State Corporation Commission. Makes the State Corporation Commission (SCC) subject to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) and designates venue for FOIA petitions against the SCC. The bill reverses a case holding that the Freedom of Information Act is not applicable to the SCC (Christian v. State Corporation Commission, November 2011).
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; State Corporation Commission subject to Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102308D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2321 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2321+hil |