VA HB2320 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cooperative online degree program plan. Requires the Secretary of Education and the Director of the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, in consultation with each two-year or four-year, public or private, nonprofit institution of higher education in the Commonwealth and the Virginia Community College System, to develop a plan to establish and advertise a cooperative degree program whereby any undergraduate student enrolled at any two-year or four-year, public or private, nonprofit institution of higher education in the Commonwealth may complete, through the use of online courses at any such institution, the course credit requirements to receive a degree at a tuition cost not to exceed $4,000, or such cost that is achievable, per academic year. The Secretary and Director shall report no later than October 1, 2016, to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Finance, and the Senate Committee on Education and Health on the progress made toward developing such cooperative degree program plan.
Title
Cooperative degree program; Secretary of Education, et al., shall develop a plan to establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2320ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 15105249D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2320S1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105249D-S1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105249D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2320H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104574D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104574D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15102534D |