VA HB2317 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of firearms; residency of armed forces members. Provides that residency for members of the armed forces for the purpose of firearms purchases in the Commonwealth shall include both the member's permanent duty post and the nearby state in which the member resides and from which he commutes to the permanent duty post.
Title
Firearms; residency of armed forces members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2317ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2317H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104603D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104603D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103848D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1363 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)