VA HB2313 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; exclusions; definition of "Office of the Governor." Adds the Chief Workforce Development Advisor and the Director of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion to the definition of "Office of the Governor" for purposes of excluding the working papers and correspondence of the Office of the Governor from mandatory disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; exclusions, definition of "Office of the Governor."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Left in General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102870D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2313 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)