VA HB2309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $11 per hour effective July 1, 2017, and to $15 per hour effective July 1, 2019, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). Effective July 1. 2020, the minimum wage shall be adjusted annually to reflect the increase in the Consumer Price Index over the most recent calendar year. The measure also provides that the Virginia minimum wage applies to persons whose employment is covered by the FLSA.
Title
Minimum wage; increases wage to $11 per hour effective July 1, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103167D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2309 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2309+hil |