VA HB2305 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; guidance on the governance of academic year Governor's Schools. Requires the Board of Education to issue guidance on the governance of academic year Governor's Schools, including communication and outreach practices, admissions policies, and guidelines on diversity, equity, and inclusion training. The bill requires such guidance to focus on the importance of increasing access to Governor's Schools for historically underserved students and to include best practices on (i) conducting information sessions about the school and the availability of gifted, advanced, and specialty education program opportunities for feeder public middle schools; (ii) strengthening the student pipeline in feeder public middle schools, prioritizing the most underserved and underrepresented students and public middle schools; and (iii) conducting programs related to and evaluations of diversity, equity, and inclusion. The bill requires the Board of Education, in developing such guidance, to collaborate with relevant stakeholders representing the geographical areas served by the Regional Governor's Schools, including local school boards representing the geographical areas served by the Regional Governor's Schools, Regional Governor's School boards, and Governor's School directors. Board of Education; guidance on the governance of academic year Governor's Schools. Requires the Board of Education to issue guidance on the governance of academic year Governor's Schools, including communication and outreach practices, admissions policies, and guidelines on diversity, equity, and inclusion training. The bill requires such guidance to focus on the importance of increasing access to Governor's Schools for historically underserved students and to include best practices on (i) conducting information sessions about the school and the availability of gifted, advanced, and specialty education program opportunities for feeder public middle schools; (ii) strengthening the student pipeline in feeder public middle schools, prioritizing the most underserved and underrepresented students and public middle schools; and (iii) conducting programs related to and evaluations of diversity, equity, and inclusion. The bill requires the Board of Education, in developing such guidance, to collaborate with relevant stakeholders representing the geographical areas served by the Regional Governor's Schools, including local school boards representing the geographical areas served by the Regional Governor's Schools, Regional Governor's School boards, and Governor's School directors.
Title
Governor's Schools; Board of Education to issue guidance on the governance of academic year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103341D-E |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2305E |
2021-02-01 | House | Pending question ordered |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103341D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)