VA HB2295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions; causes of action. Provides that no employer may discharge any employee on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, including lactation. Currently, the protection against discrimination on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions applies to an employer employing more than five but fewer than 15 persons.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions; causes of action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103173D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2295 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2295+hil |