VA HB2294 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Electric and natural gas utilities; energy efficiency Electric and natural gas utilities; energy efficiency goals. Requires investor-owned electric utilities, cooperative electric utilities, and investor-owned natural gas distribution utilities to meet incremental annual energy efficiency goals. Electric utilities are required to implement cost-effective energy efficiency measures to achieve the goal of two percent savings by 2034 and thereafter, with interim goals that start at 0.25 percent for 2020-2021 and increase in biennial increments of 0.25 percent until 2034. Gas utilities are required to achieve the goal of one percent savings by 2034 and thereafter, with interim goals that start at 0.125 percent for 2020-2021 and increase in biennial increments of 0.125 percent until 2034. The utilities are required to submit energy efficiency plans with the State Corporation Commission (SCC). The SCC (i) shall order changes to a plan submitted by a utility that does not demonstrate that the utility will achieve incremental annual energy efficiency goals; (ii) shall require utilities to commence compliance efforts with the incremental annual energy efficiency goals during calendar year 2020, though it may adjust the goal for 2020 if appropriate to address a partial year of implementation; (iii) may design performance incentives that reward utilities for exceeding efficiency goals; (iv) shall require utilities to report annually to the SCC on their efforts and progress in meeting the incremental annual energy efficiency goals; and (v) shall submit reports regarding compliance with the requirements of the incremental annual

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric and natural gas utilities; energy efficiency goals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N) (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100536D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback