VA HB2292 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Culpeper. Makes technical changes to notice provisions for special meetings of town council and requires the town manager to reside within Culpeper County during his tenure of office. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Culpeper, Town of; amending charter, notice of special meetings and residence of Town Manager.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0281) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 281 (effective 3/17/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2292ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 15104065D |