VA HB2277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Certain children with disabilities; one-year high school extensions permitted. Requires any child with a disability who receives special education and related services, reaches age 22 after September 30, 2020, and is scheduled to complete high school in the spring of 2021 to be given the option for an extension to attend high school for the duration of the 2021-22 school year.
Title
Children with disabilities, certain; one-year high school extensions permitted.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102477D |