VA HB2275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2275
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Food and drink permit requirements; regulations. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Commissioner), after conducting the required inspection, to issue a permit for the operation of any food manufacturer, food storage warehouse, or retail food establishment. The bill prohibits the operation of such manufacturer, warehouse, or establishment without a permit unless the inspection finds no significant health hazard and the business is awaiting receipt of its permit, which shall be processed within 30 days of the inspection. The bill authorizes the Commissioner to deny, suspend, or revoke such permit for certain violations and authorizes the Commissioner to suspend such permit and seek an expedited informal fact-finding proceeding if conditions exist that present a significant and immediate public health hazard. Food and drink permit requirements; regulations. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Commissioner), after conducting the required inspection, to issue a permit for the operation of any food manufacturer, food storage warehouse, or retail food establishment. The bill prohibits the operation of such manufacturer, warehouse, or establishment without a permit unless the inspection finds no significant health hazard and the business is awaiting receipt of its permit, which shall be processed within 30 days of the inspection. The bill authorizes the Commissioner to deny, suspend, or revoke such permit for certain violations and authorizes the Commissioner to suspend such permit and seek an expedited informal fact-finding proceeding if conditions exist that present a significant and immediate public health hazard. The bill requires the Commissioner to issue a permit to any manufacturer, warehouse, or establishment that is legally operating on July 1, 2021, and has satisfactorily completed its most recent inspection. The bill also authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations to administer the permitting process and directs the Commissioner to develop a written appeal process for use when a permit is suspended.
Title
Food and drink permit; Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to issue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (78-Y 21-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2275H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103877D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103877D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102109D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2275 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 5100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |