VA HB2274 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; cost recovery. Permits investor-owned electric utilities to recover from certain customers, through a rate adjustment clause, the projected and actual costs of designing, implementing, and operating State Corporation Commission-approved programs that accelerate the vegetation management of distribution rights-of-way. The measure provides that these costs shall not be allocated to or recovered from certain classes of large customers.
Title
Electric utilities; cost recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15102980D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2274E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15102980D |