VA HB2272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited liability companies; Protected Series Act. Provides for the creation by a limited liability company (LLC) of one or more protected series. The measure provides that each protected series may have different ownership, management structures, assets, and liabilities. Each protected series may function in a manner analogous to a separate legal entity within the LLC that established the protected series, which is referred to as the series LLC. The measure provides a process through which debts and obligations of one protected series are neither the debts nor obligations of any other protected series nor of the series LLC. Under the measure, a separate public filing is required to establish each protected series of a series LLC. The measure specifies rules for disregarding the internal liability shields that protect the assets of one protected series from the creditors of another. The measure provides that assets not properly associated with a protected series may be subject to the claims of creditors even if the internal shields among series remain intact. The measure is based on the Uniform Protected Series Act prepared by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws. The measure has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020.
Title
Limited liability companies; Protected Series Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0636) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 636 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2272ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100497D-E |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2272E |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100497D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1051 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1061 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1062 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1064 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1065 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1067 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1088 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1099.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |