VA HB2271 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Short-term rental Short-term rental property; locality's ability to restrict property managed by a Virginia realtor. Provides that a locality may not restrict by ordinance any short-term rental property managed by a Virginia realtor, defined in the bill. The bill provides that a locality may not enforce an ordinance against such property where the ordinance (i) prohibits short-term rentals; (ii) limits occupancy in a short-term rental property to less than what is allowed under the building code or local zoning regulations; (iii) limits the number of days in a calendar year for which a short-term rental property can be rented; (iv) requires an owner to occupy the short-term rental property as his primary residence for any number of days in a calendar year; (v) requires any type of remote monitoring device to be installed on the short-term rental property, including decibel, audio, or video; (vi) requires exterior or interior inspections of the short-term rental property pertaining to any items defined under the building code more frequently than every five years, unless a complaint has been filed with the locality or building authority; (vii) requires repairs, renovations, or updates to the structure of the short-term rental property that are greater than those required under the applicable building code; or (viii) requires an owner to add additional or otherwise alter existing parking spaces for the short-term rental property. The provisions of the bill shall apply to any short-term rental property managed by a realtor and operating as such on or after January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term rental property; locality's ability to restrict property managed by a Virginia realtor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104168D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152983(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback