VA HB2271 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Computer and digital forensic services; exempt from regulation as a private security service business. Exempts from regulation as a private security service business any individual engaged in (i) computer or digital forensic services or in the acquisition, review, or analysis of digital or computer-based information, whether for purposes of obtaining or furnishing information for evidentiary or other purposes or for providing expert testimony before a court, or (ii) network or system vulnerability testing, including network scans and risk assessment and analysis of computers connected to a network.
Title
Computer and digital forensic services; exempt from regulation as private security service business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263) | |
2011-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2271ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2271H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104665D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104665D-H1 | |
2011-01-26 | House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102595D |