VA HB2270 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Withdrawal from district board of social services. Establishes a process for withdrawal from a district board of social services by the local governing body of a county or city and provides for judicial review in cases in which the Board of Social Services fails or refuses to approve the terms and conditions of a proposed plan for withdrawal from a district board of social services by a local government. The bill contains a reenactment clause.
Title
Social services, district board of; process for withdrawal by local governing body of county, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective - see bill) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2270ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103772D-E |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2270E |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned HWI sub: #1 |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103772D |