VA HB2269 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2269

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revenue share for solar energy projects and energy storage systems. Allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on certain solar energy projects and energy storage systems shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021. Revenue share for solar energy projects and energy storage systems. Allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1,400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on certain solar energy projects and energy storage systems shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar energy projects and energy storage systems; revenue share for projects and systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 429 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2269ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-15SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2269H1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103653D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103653D-H1
2021-01-27HouseReported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-19HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21102751D

Same As/Similar To

HB2269 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812636(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2269
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2269+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2269H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2269ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0429+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2269F161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2269FH1161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2269FER161+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H10C0035+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1314+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0086+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1001C0007+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02V0003+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0044+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2269+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0142HB2269+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0144HB2269+HB2269
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0145HB2269+HB2269

Bill Comments 750

feedback