VA HB2269 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2269
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue share for solar energy projects and energy storage systems. Allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on certain solar energy projects and energy storage systems shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021. Revenue share for solar energy projects and energy storage systems. Allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on certain solar energy projects and energy storage systems shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021.
Title
Solar energy projects and energy storage systems; revenue share for projects and systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2269H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103653D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103653D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102751D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2269 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)