VA HB2254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2254
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful dissemination of unsolicited, obscene image of self to another; penalty. Provides that any person who, with the intent to coerce, harass, or intimidate, disseminates to any person 18 years of age or older any unsolicited, obscene videographic or still image created by any means whatsoever that depicts himself totally nude, or in a state of undress so as to expose his own genitals, pubic area, buttocks, or female breast is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Unlawful dissemination of unsolicited, obscene image of self to another; penalty. Provides that any person who, with the intent to coerce, harass, or intimidate, disseminates to any person 18 years of age or older any unsolicited, obscene videographic or still image created by any means whatsoever that depicts himself totally nude, or in a state of undress so as to expose his own genitals, pubic area, buttocks, or female breast is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Unlawful dissemination of unsolicited obscene image of self to another; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103833D-EH1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2254EH1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment by Delegate Convirs-Fowler agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103833D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103833D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21100465D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2254 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 152.7:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |