VA HB2252 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; report required for certain prescriptions. Requires prescribers to request a report from the Prescription Monitoring Program if (i) the prescription is for a controlled substance listed in Schedule II, III, or IV of the Drug Control Act (§54.1-3400 et seq.); (ii) the prescriber has reasonable belief that the patient may be seeking the controlled substance, in whole or in part, for any reason other than for the treatment of an existing medical condition and (a) the patient is a new patient of the prescriber's or (b) the patient has not received a prescription for a controlled substance from the prescriber in the past 12 months.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; report required for certain prescriptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102473D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2252 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2252+hil |