VA HB225 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - House: Passed by in Education with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - House: Passed by in Education with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Quality; apportionment of state and local share. Directs the General Assembly, in apportioning the state and local share of the costs of meeting the Standards of Quality, beginning July 1, 2010, to implement a formula that determines each locality's ability to pay based on the ratios of (i) the reimbursement payment made to the locality for providing tangible personal property tax relief to the reimbursement payments made statewide for providing tangible personal property tax relief; (ii) the total value of real estate in the locality adjusted by the index used for the pay differential for state employees residing in that locality to the statewide value of real estate per person; (iii) the median value of residential real estate in the locality adjusted by the index used for the pay differential for state employees residing in that locality to the statewide median value of residential real estate; (iv) sales subject to the state sales tax in the locality to the statewide sales subject to the state sales tax; (v) revenue collected from the local personal property tax to the revenue collected statewide from the local personal property tax; and (vi) revenue collected from local lodging, local cigarette, and local meals taxes to the revenue collected statewide from these local lodging, cigarette, and meals taxes, as provided in the appropriation act. To determine each locality's composite index of ability to pay, (i) the sum of the ratios calculated on the basis of average daily membership for each locality shall be divided by the sum of the average daily membership ratios for all localities; (ii) the sum of the ratios calculated on a per capita basis for each locality shall be divided by the sum of the per capita ratios for all localities; and (iii) the locality's ratio calculated on the basis of average daily membership shall be multiplied by 0.66 and the locality's ratio calculated on a per capita basis shall be multiplied by 0.33. The sum of the two adjusted ratios in clause (iii) shall be the local composite index of ability to pay.
Title
Standards of Quality; apportionment of state and local share.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | House: Passed by in Education with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101936D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB225 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB225+hil |