VA HB2249 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; Department of Corrections-issued and jailer-issued identification. Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to expedite, to the extent possible, the processing of an application submitted by a prisoner for a government-issued identification card, birth certificate, or Social Security card and the issuance of such identification and documents.
Title
Prisoners; Department of Corrections-issued and jailer-issued identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104386D-H1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104101D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 116.1:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 31.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |