VA HB2246 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; certain Department of Defense employees. Provides that any civilian employees of the Department of Defense who are realigned to Virginia as a result of Base Realignment and Closure, and their dependents, shall pay the in-state tuition rate at the public institution of higher education in which they are enrolled.
Title
Tuition, in-state; certain civilian employees of Department of Defense employees shall pay.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102242D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2246 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2246+hil |