VA HB2241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Green job training tax credit. Creates an income tax credit beginning in taxable year 2019 for the expenses incurred by taxpayers in the training and transitioning of fossil fuel workers, defined in the bill, to jobs in the green energy sector. The credit equals $1,000 per employee that is transitioned to the green energy sector. In order to qualify for the credit, the worker must become employed by the taxpayer in a green job during the taxable year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green job training; creates tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Finance
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103436D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.12:13(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback