VA HB2233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (11-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (11-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans offered by foreign health insurers. Authorizes any foreign health insurer to sell individual or group health benefit plans in the Commonwealth if it is approved to sell such plans in the foreign health insurer's domiciliary state. The measure establishes requirements applicable to such benefit plans, including provisions for registration, disclosure, marketing, and financial condition. The measure has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2018.
Title
Health benefits; sale of plans offered by foreign health insurers.
Sponsors
Del. Benjamin Cline [R] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Scott Garrett [R] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (11-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2233H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104837D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104837D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102986D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 6407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |