VA HB2233 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enterprise zones. Provides that the expiration date of any enterprise zone located in a locality in which the monthly unemployment rate exceeded six percent in any of the 12 months immediately preceding January 1, 2013, shall be extended until the final day of the calendar year in which the Virginia Employment Commission determines the unemployment rate in such locality is equal to or less than six percent for a period of 12 consecutive months, or until five years after the original date of expiration, whichever occurs later. The bill expires on December 31, 2018.
Title
Enterprise zones; expiration dates and renewal periods extended in certain counties and cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103394D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2233 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2233+hil |