VA HB2231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Group Violence Intervention Board; Division of Group Violence Intervention; Project Ceasefire Grant Fund; Project Exit Grant Fund. Establishes the Group Violence Intervention Board to coordinate and assist federal, state, and local group violence intervention efforts. The bill also establishes within the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) the Division of Group Violence Intervention (the Division), to be headed by an executive director appointed by the Director of the Department. The bill provides that the Division is responsible for (i) coordinating the efforts of members of state and local law enforcement, community members, and social services providers to combat group violence; (ii) serving as a clearinghouse for research, best practices, and strategies that may be utilized in the implementation, execution, and evaluation of group violence interventions; and (iii) implementing and administering various federal, state, and local grant funds that aid group violence intervention efforts. Finally, the bill creates the Project Ceasefire Grant Fund, which provides money to organizations that are involved in group violence intervention efforts, and creates the Project Exit Grant Fund, which provides money to organizations that assist former gang members or individuals attempting to leave gangs.
Title
Group Violence Intervention Board and Division of Group Violence Intervention; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103405D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101686D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2499.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2499.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 194 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 198 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |