VA HB222 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Legal notices. Allows localities to meet certain notice requirements by utilizing their websites, radio or television rather than a newspaper of general circulation.
Title
Legal notices; allows localities to meet notice requirements by utilizing their websites, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103675D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB222 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB222+hil |