VA HB2213 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2213

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Work group; gold mining; report. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Health and Human Resources, and the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to study the mining of gold in the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the study be conducted in consultation with the Virginia Council on Environmental Justice and appropriate stakeholders, including experts in mining, hydrology, toxicology, and other fields; environmental organizations; representatives of potentially affected communities in localities with significant deposits of gold; and residents of Native American communities in such localities. Work group; gold mining; report. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Health and Human Resources, and the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to study the mining of gold in the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the study be conducted in consultation with the Virginia Council on Environmental Justice and appropriate stakeholders, including experts in mining, hydrology, toxicology, and other fields; environmental organizations; representatives of potentially affected communities in localities with significant deposits of gold; and residents of Native American communities in such localities. The bill provides that the work group shall evaluate the impacts of gold mining on public health, safety, and welfare; evaluate whether existing air and water quality regulations are sufficient to protect air and water quality from the mining and processing of gold; evaluate whether existing bonding, reclamation, closure, and long-term monitoring of sites for such mining or processing are sufficient; and report its findings to the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold; Secretary of Natural Resources, et al., to study mining and processing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0423)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 423 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2213ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: Adoption (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (23-Y 16-N)
2021-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-16SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateReported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2213H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104164D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104164D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-27HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules (13-Y 5-N)
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102931D

Same As/Similar To

HB2213 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2213
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2213+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2213H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2213ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0423+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2213AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2213ASE
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2213F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2213FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2213FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H20C0015+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0201C0014+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0110+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1503+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S10C0028+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S10V0001+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB2213+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0056HB2213+HB2213
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1736+HB2213

Bill Comments 750

feedback