VA HB2213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Work group; gold mining; prohibition on permitting; report. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Health and Human Resources, and the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to study the mining of gold in the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the study be conducted in consultation with the Virginia Council on Environmental Justice and appropriate stakeholders, including experts in mining, hydrology, toxicology, and other fields; environmental organizations; representatives of potentially affected communities in localities with significant deposits of gold; and residents of Native American communities in such counties. Work group; gold mining; prohibition on permitting; report. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources, the Secretary of Health and Human Resources, and the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to study the mining of gold in the Commonwealth. The bill requires that the study be conducted in consultation with the Virginia Council on Environmental Justice and appropriate stakeholders, including experts in mining, hydrology, toxicology, and other fields; environmental organizations; representatives of potentially affected communities in localities with significant deposits of gold; and residents of Native American communities in such counties. The bill provides that the work group shall evaluate the impacts of gold mining on public health, safety, and welfare; evaluate whether existing air and water quality regulations are sufficient to protect air and water quality from the mining and processing of gold; and evaluate whether existing bonding, reclamation, closure, and long-term monitoring of sites for such mining or processing are sufficient; and report its findings to the General Assembly by July 1, 2022. The bill also prohibits the issuance of any permit by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy to operate a gold mine of an area larger than 10 acres until July 1, 2023.
Title
Gold; Secretary of Natural Resources, et al., to study mining and processing.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2213H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104164D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104164D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102931D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2213 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)