VA HB2212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Certain private roads or rights-of-way; gates and fences. Removes the requirement that a petitioner prove that a gate was willfully and maliciously erected in order for a court to require a landowner to make necessary and reasonable changes to a gate erected by such landowner across a private road or right-of-way owned by another person. The bill clarifies that this does not prohibit the replacement of a gate with a cattle guard as authorized by current law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain private roads or rights-of-way; gates and fences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0542)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 542 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2212ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-29HouseReferred from Transportation by voice vote
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101585D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332110(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2212
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2212+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2212ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0542+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0018+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0067+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0106+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2376+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0143+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2212+HB2212
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2212+HB2212

Bill Comments

feedback