VA HB2212 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State Police vehicular pursuit database. Provides that the Department of State Police shall develop and maintain a Law-Enforcement Pursuit Database compiling incident reports of vehicular pursuits occurring statewide The database is to be made available to the Governor and General Assembly upon request and to any other entity so directed by the Governor or General Assembly. The bill requires law-enforcement agencies with law-enforcement duties to submit vehicular pursuit incident reports for each calendar year to the State Police annually on March 1, beginning March 1, 2013. The bill also defines "vehicular pursuit" to mean an active attempt by a law-enforcement officer in an authorized emergency vehicle to apprehend a fleeing suspect who is actively attempting to elude the law-enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-Enforcement Pursuit Database; State Police to develop and maintain.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-28 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2011-01-27 House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102185D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback