VA HB2209 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board's powers and duties. Transfers authority for administration of the nutrient management certification program and responsibility for adopting regulations on nitrogen application rates from the Department of Conservation and Recreation to the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board. The bill also empowers the Board to oversee districts' programs and to allocate general fund moneys to soil and water conservation districts to support their operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
2013-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 593 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-20SenateSigned by President
2013-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2209ER)
2013-02-20HouseEnrolled
2013-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
2013-02-14HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
2013-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-02-12SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2013-02-12SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2013-02-12SenateReading of amendment waived
2013-02-12SenateRead third time
2013-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2013-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2013-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2013-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2209H1
2013-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 13104165D-H1
2013-01-25HouseRead second time
2013-01-24HouseRead first time
2013-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 13104165D-H1
2013-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2013-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 13103324D

Same As/Similar To

SB1309 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101104.2(n/a)See Bill Text
101104.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
101104.4(n/a)See Bill Text
101104.5(n/a)See Bill Text
101505(n/a)See Bill Text
101546.1(n/a)See Bill Text
101546.2(n/a)See Bill Text
101546.3(n/a)See Bill Text
221105(n/a)See Bill Text
323602.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.19:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2209
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2209+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2209H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2209ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0593+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H01V0040+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0298+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S01V0061+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0449HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0462HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0913+HB2209

Bill Comments 750

feedback