VA SB1309 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board's powers and duties. Transfers authority for administration of the nutrient management certification program and responsibility for adopting regulations on nitrogen application rates from the Department of Conservation and Recreation to the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board. The bill also empowers the Board to oversee districts' programs and to allocate general fund moneys to soil and water conservation districts to support their operations.
Title
Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1309ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1309 |
2013-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-08 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1309S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104385D-S1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104385D-S1 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103828D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2209 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0593)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Conservation
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts
Conservation
Drainage, Soil Conservation, Sanitation, and Public Facilities Districts