VA HB2209 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property transfer; Virginia Commonwealth University: City of Richmond. Authorizes the board of visitors of Virginia Commonwealth University to convey certain real property to the City of Richmond. Under the bill, the property must be used for the official Richmond Slave Trail located in Richmond, Virginia, and such use must commence within five years of the conveyance. If these conditions are not met, the property shall revert to the board of visitors of Virginia Commonwealth University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Commonwealth University; board of visitors to convey certain property to City of Richmond.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
2011-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-23 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-22 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-22 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2209ER)
2011-02-22 House: Enrolled
2011-02-16 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-16 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-15 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2011-02-09 Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-02-09 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-08 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Printed as engrossed 11103724D-E
2011-02-07 House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2209E
2011-02-07 House: Amendment by Delegate McQuinn agreed to
2011-02-07 House: Committee amendments agreed to
2011-02-07 House: Read second time
2011-02-06 House: Read first time
2011-02-03 House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
2011-01-25 House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103724D

Same As/Similar To

SB971 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2209
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2209+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2209E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2209ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0578+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1104V0025+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H11V0100+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0638+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S03V0249+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0421HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0432HB2209+HB2209

Bill Comments 750

feedback