VA HB2207 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Food stamp program; excessive requests for replacement of electronic benefit transfer card. Requires the Department of Social Services (the Department) to monitor all requests for replacement of electronic benefit transfer (EBT) cards issued to food stamp program recipients. The bill provides that a request for replacement of an EBT card shall be deemed excessive if a food stamp program recipient or a member of his household has made four such requests within 12 months prior to the request. The bill requires the Department, upon receipt of a fourth request for replacement of an EBT card within a 12-month period, to give written notice to the recipient household that it has reached the threshold allowance for replacement requests, its account is being monitored for suspicious activity, and future replacement requests will require contact with the Department to provide an explanation before a replacement card will be issued. The bill requires the Department, upon receipt of a fifth replacement request within a 12-month period, to give written notice to the recipient household that it has exceeded the threshold allowance for replacement requests and that the replacement EBT card is being withheld until the household contacts the Department to provide an explanation for the high volume of replacement requests. The bill provides the terms under which a replacement card will be issued or withheld, delineates factors that require the Department to investigate excessive card replacement requests, and sets forth requirements for notices sent under the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food stamp program; requests for replacement of electronic benefit transfer card.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 30-N) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (66-Y 34-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2207ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 30-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (65-Y 30-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-24SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N)
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Sturtevant, Black, Petersen
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Robinson, Yost, Murphy
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendment (37-Y 3-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 94-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendment (20-Y 19-N)
2017-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-25HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 29-N)
2017-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (70-Y 29-N)
2017-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-23HousePassed by for the day
2017-01-20HouseRead first time
2017-01-19HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N)
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100919D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632523.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2207
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2207+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2207ER+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0038+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1578+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S09V0081+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0283+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0665HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2616+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0819HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1028HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1051HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1052HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2787+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2865+HB2207

Bill Comments 750

feedback